|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
991 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
519 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
537 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
553 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
438 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
383 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
460 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
519 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
1425 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
499 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
535 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
557 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
1013 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
524 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
497 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
523 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
550 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
510 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
555 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
1365 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
488 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
3724 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
528 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
382 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
1982 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
547 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
542 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
689 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
436 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
543 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
557 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
546 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
505 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
555 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
568 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
549 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
524 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
447 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
546 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
546 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
516 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
3168 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
487 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
563 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
543 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
573 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
510 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
423 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
528 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
537 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
547 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
550 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
529 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
519 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
520 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
396 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
503 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
531 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
402 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
462 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
1283 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
409 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
482 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
526 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
533 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
388 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
538 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
515 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
546 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
629 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
523 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
527 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
511 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
568 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
514 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
584 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
525 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
525 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
528 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
521 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
406 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
431 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
404 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
398 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
511 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
473 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
514 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
529 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
429 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
521 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
534 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
548 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
504 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
517 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
464 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
546 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
489 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
6347 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
410 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
547 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
7048 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
495 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
543 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
266 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
243 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
396 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
471 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
416 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
281 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
301 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
503 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
544 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
445 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
551 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
379 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
507 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
219 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
253 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
478 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
11.08.2003 |
Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2002 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.2001 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
577 |