Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
06.12.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |
21.09.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] |
21.09.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] |
16.09.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.09.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.09.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.09.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.07.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.02.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.11.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.08.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.04.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication |