EP1258146 - COMPRESSED VIDEO ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REITMEIER, Glenn, Arthur 193 Cinnabar Lane Yardley, PA 19067 / US | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Pratt, Richard Wilson D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01913054.1 | 26.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001US06094 | Priority number, date | US20000512406 | 24.02.2000 Original published format: US 512406 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0163937 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1258146 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
H04N19/90 (EP);
H04N19/142 (EP);
H04N19/179 (EP);
H04N19/48 (EP);
H04N19/503 (EP);
H04N19/87 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSE VON KOMPRIMIERTEM VIDEO | [2002/47] | English: | COMPRESSED VIDEO ANALYSIS | [2002/47] | French: | ANALYSE DE VIDEO COMPRIMEE | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 13.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9852356 (CHANG SHIH FU ;UNIV COLUMBIA (US); MENG JIANHAO (US)) [X] 1-5,8-10 * page 12, line 4 - page 13, line 29 * * page 16, line 17 - page 19, line 14 * * figures 2,6 * [Y] 6,7; | [XA]US5911008 (SATOH TAKASHI ET AL) [X] 1-4,8-10 * column 14, line 60 - column 19, line 8 * * column 25, line 22 - line 36 * * column 27, line 63 - column 28, line 14 * * figures 8-15,24 * [A] 5-7; | [YA] - BOYCE J M, "NOISE REDUCTION OF IMAGE SEQUENCES USING ADAPTIVE MOTION COMPENSATED FRAME AVERAGING", MULTIDIMENSIONAL SIGNAL PROCESSING. SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 23 - 26, 1992, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920323), vol. 3 CONF. 17, ISBN 0-7803-0532-9, pages 461 - 464, XP000378968 [Y] 6,7 * pages III-461, paragraph 1 * [A] 1-5,8-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1992.226176 | [XA] - HONGJIANG ZHANG ET AL, "VIDEO PARSING AND BROWSING USING COMPRESSED DATA", MULTIMEDIA TOOLS AND APPLICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BOSTON, US, (1995), vol. 1, ISSN 1380-7501, pages 89 - 111, XP000571810 [X] 1,3-5,8-10 * page 92, paragraph 3.2 * * page 95, paragraph 3.3 * * page 97, paragraph 3.4 * * figures 8,9 * [A] 2,6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01261227 |