EP1259575 - IMPROVED DEICER AND PRE-WETTING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West, P.O. Box 5624 Minneapolis, MN 55440-5624 / US | [2006/39] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Cargill Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West, P.O. Box 5624 Minneapolis, MN 55440-5624 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOEFOD, Robert, S. 9864 Hemlock Way Maple Grove, MN 55369 / US | 02 /
ROSE, Richard, H., III 1227 Carmen Drive Glendale, CA 91207 / US | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01913118.4 | 27.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001US06291 | Priority number, date | US20000185482P | 28.02.2000 Original published format: US 185482 P | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0164811 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1259575 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259575 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
C09K3/185 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES ENTEISUNGS- UND BEFEUCHTUNGSMITTEL | [2002/48] | English: | IMPROVED DEICER AND PRE-WETTING AGENT | [2002/48] | French: | DEGIVRANT AMELIORE ET AGENT DE PRE-HUMIDIFICATION | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2006 | BE | 27.09.2006 | CH | 27.09.2006 | CY | 27.09.2006 | IT | 27.09.2006 | LI | 27.09.2006 | NL | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | ES | 07.01.2007 | IE | 27.02.2007 | LU | 27.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | PT | 13.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CY | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
IE | 27.02.2007 | ||
LU | 27.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
IE | 27.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
IE | 27.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | NL | 27.09.2006 | |
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 27.09.2006 | |
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 27.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]SU1664808 ; | [X]WO8703293 (ALKOTO IFJUSAG EGYESUELES [HU]) [X] 1-3,12,13 * example 2; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US5211868 (IRELAND DONALD T [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * claims 1-16 *; | [A]CA2135662 (TOTH JENO [HU], et al) [A] 1-22* claims 1,2,9 *; | [X]US5965058 (JANKE GEORGE A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12,13,16 * example ..; claims 1-40 *; | [PX]US6149834 (GALL JAMES A [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,9,12,13 * claims 1-4; table 2 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 25, Database accession no. 1992-207078, XP002172014 & SU1664808 A 19910723 (KURSK POLY) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |