22.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
28.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
27.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
13.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
19.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
13.11.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
24.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
12.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
25.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
30.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
30.11.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.09.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
18.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.10.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
17.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2002 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.09.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
26.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|