EP1286367 - ELECTROMAGNET CORE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE ELECTROMAGNET CORE, AND ELEVATOR HOIST BRAKE UTILIZING THE ELECTROMAGNET CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHINOO, Tomokazu, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
HORITA, Tsuyoshi, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01914212.4 | 23.03.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001JP02351 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02078020 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1286367 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286367 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B66D5/30, H01F7/08, H01F41/06, H01F27/24 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
H01F7/081 (EP);
B66D5/30 (EP);
H01F7/06 (EP);
H01F3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/09] | H01F7/20, H01F41/02, B66B11/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2009/50] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETKERN, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND ELEVATOR-HOIST-BREMSE MIT DEM ELEKTROMAGNETKERN | [2003/09] | English: | ELECTROMAGNET CORE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE ELECTROMAGNET CORE, AND ELEVATOR HOIST BRAKE UTILIZING THE ELECTROMAGNET CORE | [2003/09] | French: | NOYAU ELECTROMAGNETIQUE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CE NOYAU ELECTROMAGNETIQUE, ET FREIN D'APPAREIL ELEVATEUR UTILISANT CE NOYAU ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2002 | Translation filed | 23.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 10.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5654016 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [ ] * column A * | International search | [A]JPS54152158 ; | [A]JPH06251954 ; | [A]JPH02106590 |