EP1256089 - TACTILE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Technology-to-Business Center, LLC 1995 University Avenue, Suite 375 Berkeley, CA 94704 / US | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Siemens Technology-to-Business Center, LLC 1995 University Avenue, Suite 375 Berkeley, CA 94704 / US | ||
For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNUSSEN, Bjoern 1030 Ventura Avenue Albany, CA 94706 / US | 02 /
VALFORT, Cyril Les Chazeaux F-42260 Bussy-Albieux / FR | 03 /
DAHLEY, Andrew 687 Kansas Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 04 /
SU, Victor 3011 Benvenure Avenue Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Wheatley, Alison Clare, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Clarke, Alison Clare, et al Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Chamberlain, Alan James, et al Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2004/38] | Vigars, Christopher Ian, et al HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay, 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | ||
Former [2002/46] | Abrams, Michael John, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01914378.3 | 15.02.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001US04837 | Priority number, date | US20000504207 | 15.02.2000 Original published format: US 504207 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0161634 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256089 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/045 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
G06F3/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/46] | G06K11/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAKTILER SENSOR | [2002/46] | English: | TACTILE SENSOR | [2002/46] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDES DE DETECTION TACTILE | [2002/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 28.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO0142754 (SIEMENS AG) [E] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [X]US5060527 (BURGESS LESTER E) [X] 1-21,23-39 * column 4, paragraph 3 - column 5, paragraph 3 * * column 8, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * figures 1,5 *; | [X]JPS564885 ; | [X]US4575580 (JANDRELL LOUIS H M) [X] 1-8,13-21,23-31,36-39 * column W *; | [X]DE19750671 (WEIS KARSTEN) [X] 1,21,23,24 * abstract * * column 2, line 5 - line 46 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 30 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810407), vol. 005, no. 048, Database accession no. (P - 055), & JP56004885 A 19810119 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-8,13-21,23-31,36-39 * abstract * |