EP1261739 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING A SAMPLE FOR ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exact Sciences Corporation 100 Campus Drive Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states EXACT Sciences Corporation 100 Campus Drive Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Exact Sciences Corporation 63 Great Road Maynard, MA 01754 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPIDUS, Stanley, N. 12 Old Evergreen Road Bedford, NH 03110 / US | 02 /
SLOAN, Walker, M., III 44 Coburn Road Berlin, MA 01503 / US | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2002/49] | Muir, Justine Claire Graham Watt & Co. 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01914503.6 | 27.02.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001US06118 | Priority number, date | US20000514559 | 28.02.2000 Original published format: US 514559 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0164950 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1261739 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, B01J19/00, B01L3/00, B01L3/02 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
B01L3/0265 (EP);
B01L3/5025 (EP);
B01L2200/0605 (EP);
G01N2035/00247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORBEREITUNG EINER PROBE FÜR EIN ANALYSEVERFAHREN | [2002/49] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING A SAMPLE FOR ANALYSIS | [2002/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ECHANTILLON POUR ANALYSE | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 02.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5798215 (RIBI HANS O ET AL) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,12 * column 6, line 37 - column 6, line 54 * * column 8, line 18 - column 9, line 58 * * column 10, line 24 - column 10, line 57 * * column 16, line 53 - column 17, line 6 * * column 17, line 28 - column 17, line 48 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0803288 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK) [A] 1-3,10,12,13,15,16,21 * column 19, line 6 - column 20, line 35 * * column 22, line 17 - column 23, line 12 * * column 26, line 40 - column 27, line 50 * * figures 7,9,13 *; | [A]WO9958245 (AMERSHAM PHARM BIOTECH AB ;ALLMER KLAS (SE); ANDERSSON PER (SE); L) [A] 1-3,5,7,8,4,6,9 * page 2, line 7 - page 2, line 21 * * page 3, line 3 - page 3, line 22 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 25 * * example 2 * * figures 6,8 *; | [A]US5338666 (MONTHONY JAMES F ET AL) [A] 1,12,13,16,21,27,28 * column 5, line 1 - column 5, line 6 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 5 * * column 8, line 26 - column 8, line 34 * * column 8, line 43 - column 8, line 62 *; | [A]WO9960397 (UNIV WASHINGTON) [A] 16 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 5 * * page 16, line 20 - page 17, line 6 * * figure 12 * |