EP1266503 - PROCESSING NETWORK COMMUNICATION CONTROL MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2010/04] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'NEILL, Alan William 2 Rachaels Court, 36 Cemetery Road Ipswich, Suffolk IP4 2JA / GB | 02 /
CLARKE, Philip Martyn 8 Cromarty Road Ipswich, Suffolk IP4 3EU / GB | 03 /
FELTON, Paul Jonathan 44 Springland Close Ipswich, Suffolk IP4 5BZ / GB | 04 /
BEAUCHAMPS, Caroline Marcelle Odette 30 Armingford Crescent Melbourn, Hertfordshire SG8 6NG / GB | 05 /
BAKER, Shaun Stephen Mommsenstrasse 17 8044 Zurich / CH | [2002/51] | Application number, filing date | 01915503.5 | 26.03.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001GB01343 | Priority number, date | EP20000302424 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: EP 00302424 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0174030 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266503 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1266503 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/58 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L67/561 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/169 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON NETZKOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERNACHRICHTEN | [2002/51] | English: | PROCESSING NETWORK COMMUNICATION CONTROL MESSAGES | [2002/51] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE MESSAGES DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATIONS RÉSEAU | [2009/33] |
Former [2002/51] | TRAITEMENT DE MESSAGES DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATIONS R SEAU | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/01] | Request for further processing for: | 17.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0458717 (IBM [US]) [A] 5-8* column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 13 *; | [A]EP0462725 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-4,8-11,13-16 * page 6, line 58 - page 7, line 56; claims 1,2 *; | [XA] - TANG D ET AL, "A GATEWAY BETWEEN MHS (X.400) AND SMTP", PROCEEDINGS OF THE COMPUTER STANDARDS CONFERENCE. (COMPSTAN),US,WASHINGTON, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19880321), vol. CONF. 2, ISBN 0-8186-0791-2, pages 7 - 14, XP000345678 [X] 1,9,10,13-16 * page 10, column R, paragraph 5.1 - page 12, column L, line 4 * * page 12, column R, paragraph 6 - page 13, column L, line 37 * [A] 2-4,8,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CSTAND.1988.4753 | [A] - SCHULZRINNE H ET AL, "INTERNET TELEPHONY: ARCHITECTURE AND PROTOCOLS - AN IETF PERSPECTIVE", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS,NL,NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, (19990211), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 237 - 255, XP000700321 [A] 11,12 * page 246, paragraph 5.1 - page 249, column R, line 6 * * page 251, column R, line 17 - page 253, column L, line 27 * |