EP1272308 - SOLID PHASE WELDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus UK Limited New Filton House, Filton Bristol, BS99 7AR / GB | [2006/08] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEPHERD, Gerald, Edward 7 Vayre Close, Chipping Sodbury Bristol BS37 6NT / GB | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Edis, Ronald Malcolm, et al BAE Systems plc Group Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Edis, Ronald Malcolm, et al BAE SYSTEMS, Group IP Department, Lancaster House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01915543.1 | 30.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001GB01421 | Priority number, date | GB20000008919 | 11.04.2000 Original published format: GB 0008919 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0176804 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272308 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1272308 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/12 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
B23K20/1265 (EP,US);
B23K20/1285 (EP,US);
B23K20/129 (EP,US);
B64F5/40 (EP,US);
B23K2101/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIBRÜHRSCHWEISSEN | [2003/02] | English: | SOLID PHASE WELDING | [2003/02] | French: | SOUDAGE PAR PRESSION | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2007 | BE | 18.07.2007 | CH | 18.07.2007 | CY | 18.07.2007 | DK | 18.07.2007 | FI | 18.07.2007 | LI | 18.07.2007 | NL | 18.07.2007 | TR | 18.07.2007 | SE | 18.10.2007 | GR | 19.10.2007 | PT | 18.12.2007 | LU | 30.03.2008 | IE | 31.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
TR | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
LU | 30.03.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
LU | 30.03.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 18.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH1128585 ; | [X]US5460317 (THOMAS WAYNE M [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 8, line 32 - line 52 *; | [Y]US5713507 (HOLT ELMO S [US], et al) [Y] 21* abstract *; | [XY]WO9851441 (ESAB AB [SE], et al) [X] 12-20 * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 5 * * page - * [Y] 21; | [A] - DAWES C J ET AL, "FRICTION STIR PROCESS WELDS ALUMINUM ALLOYS", WELDING JOURNAL,US,AMERICAN WELDING SOCIETY. MIAMI, (19960301), vol. 75, no. 3, ISSN 0043-2296, pages 41 - 45, XP000587301 [A] 1-11 * table 2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11028585 A 19990202 (SHOWA ALUM CORP) [X] 12-18,20-22,25-27 * abstract * |