EP1264057 - LEDGER WITH LOCKING DEVICE FOR MODULAR SCAFFOLDING OR SIMILAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/50] | LOCKING DEVICE FOR MODULAR SCAFFOLDING OR SIMILAR | ||
[2015/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAKI Aktiebolag 289 72 SIBBHULT / SE | [2015/47] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Haki AB P.O. Box 102 280 63 Sibbhult / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSKARSSON, Ulf P.O. Box 1341 S-280 63 Sibbhult / SE | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2009/32] | Bengtsson, Peggy Katrin, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2002/50] | Akerman, Marten Lennart, et al Albihns Malmö AB Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 01915977.1 | 13.03.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001SE00518 | Priority number, date | SE20000000867 | 15.03.2000 Original published format: SE 0000867 | [2002/50] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0169009 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1264057 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1264057 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04G7/30 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
E04G7/307 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | LT | 02.09.2002 | LV | 02.09.2002 | Title | German: | GELÄNDER MIT VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN MODULARES GERÜST ODER ÄHNLICHES | [2015/44] | English: | LEDGER WITH LOCKING DEVICE FOR MODULAR SCAFFOLDING OR SIMILAR | [2015/44] | French: | MOISE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE POUR ECHAFAUDAGE MODULAIRE | [2015/44] |
Former [2002/50] | VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN MODULARES GERÜST ODER ÄHNLICHES | ||
Former [2002/50] | LOCKING DEVICE FOR MODULAR SCAFFOLDING OR SIMILAR | ||
Former [2002/50] | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE POUR ECHAFAUDAGE MODULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2010 | Observations by third parties | 09.02.2011 | Observations by third parties | 03.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | PT | 30.01.2017 | IE | 13.03.2017 | LU | 13.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.03.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 13.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | GR | 29.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3874802 (LINDSEY EDWARD GEORGE); | [A]US4592689 (LEITZKE RUE S [US]); | [X]US4630956 (GILBREATH WILLIAM E [US]); | [A]EP0596404 (SCOZZARI AGOSTINO [DE]); | [A]GB2310000 (NOLAN JAMES GERALD [GB]) | other | US5988317 | US4197642 |