EP1272582 - RUBBER-METAL COMPOSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 2500 Renaissance Boulevard, Suite 200 Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGARWAL, Rajat, K. 4775 Pine Eagles Drive Brighton, MI 48116 / US | 02 /
FRISTAD, William, E. 3724 New Castle Drive Rochester Hills, MI 48306 / US | 03 /
ROSSIER, Gregg, W. 2525 Foxcliff N. Martinsville, IN 46151 / US | 04 /
SKIKUN, Roman 41491 Reindeer Drive Novi, MI 48375 / US | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Endres, Helmut Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Endres, Helmut Henkel KGaA Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01916126.4 | 20.02.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001US05255 | Priority number, date | US20000183603P | 18.02.2000 Original published format: US 183603 P | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160935 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272582 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1272582 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/00, B05D7/14, C08J5/12 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C09J5/00 (EP);
C08L63/00 (EP);
C09J2400/163 (EP);
C09J2421/006 (EP);
C09J2463/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/02] | C09J5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GUMMI-METALL-VERBUNDWERKSTOFF | [2003/02] | English: | RUBBER-METAL COMPOSITES | [2003/02] | French: | COMPOSITES EN CAOUTCHOUC-METAL | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 17.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5500460 (AHMED BASHIR M [US], et al) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9707163 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1-15* the whole document *; | [DA]WO9930841 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0043131 (LORD CORP [US]) [PX] 1,13-15 * examples 1,2; claims 8,9,11 * | International search | [Y]JPS56135052 ; | [Y]US3042545 ; | [Y]US5500460 |