EP1257377 - RAPID CONVERSION OF METAL-CONTAINING COMPOUNDS TO FORM METALS OR METAL OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMG Americas, Inc. 2601 Weck Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-2166 / US | For all designated states University Technology Corporation Suite 250, 3101 Iris Avenue Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states OMG Americas, Inc. 2601 Weck Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-2166 / US | ||
For all designated states University Technology Corporation Suite 250, 3101 Iris Avenue Boulder, CO 80301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNMEAD, Stephen 3708 East Acron Lane Midland, MI 48642 / US | 02 /
WEINER, Alan, W. 6967 Springhill Drive Niwot, CO 80503 / US | 03 /
BUECHLER, Karen, J. 8685 North Carr Loop Westminster, CO 80005 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Jacob, A. 13185 Twelve Oaks Ridge Roscoe, IL 61073 / US | 05 /
KARPALE, Kauko, Johannes Finnepakintie 12 FIN-28400 Ulvila / FI | [2003/05] |
Former [2002/47] | 01 /
DUNMEAD, Stephen 3708 East Acron Lane Midland, MI 48642 / US | ||
02 /
WEINER, Alan, W. 6967 Springhill Drive Niwot, CO 80503 / US | |||
03 /
BUECHLER, Karen, J. 8685 North Carr Loop Westminster, CO 80005 / US | |||
04 /
JOHNSON, Jacob, A. 5124 Williams Fork Trail 102 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | |||
05 /
KARPALE, Kauko, Johannes Finnepakintie 12 FIN-28400 Ulvila / FI | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01916222.1 | 22.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001US06032 | Priority number, date | US20000184029P | 22.02.2000 Original published format: US 184029 P | US20000202305P | 05.05.2000 Original published format: US 202305 P | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0162421 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257377 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B22F9/20, B22F9/30, C01G1/02, C01G51/04, C01G53/04, B22F9/16, B01J37/08, B01J37/12, B01J37/16, C01B13/18, C01F17/00, C01G3/02 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B22F9/20 (KR);
B22F9/22 (EP,US);
B01J37/082 (EP,US);
B01J37/12 (EP,US);
B01J37/16 (EP,US);
B01J8/087 (EP,US);
B01J8/12 (EP,US);
B22F9/16 (EP,US);
B22F9/30 (EP,US);
C01B13/18 (EP,US);
C01F17/224 (EP,US);
C01F17/229 (EP,US);
C01F17/235 (EP,US);
C01G1/02 (EP,US);
C01G3/02 (EP,US);
C01G51/04 (EP,US);
C01G53/04 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00557 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0277 (EP,US);
B01J23/70 (EP,US);
C01P2002/60 (EP,US);
C01P2002/88 (EP,US);
C01P2004/50 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/11 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/47] | B22F9/20, B22F9/30, C01G1/02, C01G51/04, C01G53/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | 23.08.2002 | LT | 23.08.2002 | LV | 23.08.2002 | MK | 23.08.2002 | RO | 23.08.2002 | SI | 23.08.2002 | Title | German: | SCHNELLE UMWANDLUNG EINER METALLHALTIGEN ZUSAMMENSTZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLEN ODER METALLOXIDEN | [2002/47] | English: | RAPID CONVERSION OF METAL-CONTAINING COMPOUNDS TO FORM METALS OR METAL OXIDES | [2002/47] | French: | CONVERSION RAPIDE DE COMPOSES CONTENANT DU METAL EN METAUX OU OXYDES METALLIQUES | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2003 | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4844736 (SHIMO NOBUO [JP], et al); | [X]US5110565 (WEIMER ALAN W [US], et al); | [X]US5221322 (TOKUOKA YASUMICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5707419 (TSANTRIZOS PETER G [CA], et al); | [X]US5746803 (DUNMEAD STEPHEN D [US], et al); | [X]US5851507 (PIRZADA SHAHID [US], et al); | [X]US5976217 (KNERINGER GUENTER [AT], et al) |