EP1255790 - NOVEL SURFACE-MODIFIED PEARL PIGMENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2007/16] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Bangyin Jotoh Mansion B-303, 2-7-16 Jotoh, Taira Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken 970-8026 / JP | 02 /
NITTA, Katsuhisa 1-3-2, Shonandai Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken 971-8152 / JP | [2002/46] | Application number, filing date | 01916969.7 | 31.01.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001EP00999 | Priority number, date | JP20000033129 | 10.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000033129 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0159014 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1255790 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255790 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, C09C3/00 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
C09C1/0015 (EP,KR,US);
C09C3/006 (EP,KR,US);
C09C3/063 (EP,KR,US);
C09C3/10 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/88 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/60 (EP,US);
C01P2006/65 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/66 (EP,KR,US);
C09C2200/401 (EP,KR,US);
C09C2200/507 (EP,US);
C09C2220/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTE PERLGLANZPIGMENTE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2002/46] | English: | NOVEL SURFACE-MODIFIED PEARL PIGMENT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2002/46] | French: | NOUVEAUX PIGMENTS NACRES MODIFIES EN SURFACE ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2002/46] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 24.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Request for further processing for: | 01.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2007 | BE | 18.04.2007 | CH | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | FR | 18.04.2007 | IT | 18.04.2007 | LI | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | TR | 18.04.2007 | SE | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.07.2007 | ES | 29.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
FR | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
FR | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
FR | 14.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 29.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DA]JPH0948707 ; | [A]EP0459634 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [A]EP0560144 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 26 *; | [A]EP0649886 (MEARL CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 31; examples 1-4 *; | [E]EP1090963 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-7 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] - [0012]; claims 1-6 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09048707 A 19970218 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [DA] 1-7 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS63130673 | JPH01292067 | JPH04296371 | JPH05171058 | JPH0616964 | JPH0948930 | JPH0948707 |