EP1272604 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING DETERGENTS IN LIQUID TO GEL FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2003/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TODTBERG, Jörg Höhenweg 129 46147 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
MENKE, Ronald Nietzschestrasse 9 40822 Mettmann / DE | 03 /
DÄMBKES, Wilhelm Maxhöfe 8 47877 Willich / DE | [2003/02] | Application number, filing date | 01917123.0 | 28.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001EP03521 | Priority number, date | DE2000117540 | 08.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10017540 | [2003/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0177275 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272604 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D17/00 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
C11D17/003 (EP);
C11D11/0094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB [2004/19] |
Former [2003/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN BIS GELFÖRMIGEN REINIGUNGSMITTELN | [2003/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING DETERGENTS IN LIQUID TO GEL FORM | [2003/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DETERGENTS LIQUIDES A GELS | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2003 | 31.03.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3903598 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [A] 1,3-5,7,8 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 50; claims 26-38 *; | [A]US5518645 (BEAUJEAN HANS-JOSEF ET AL) [A] 1,3,4,8 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0441057 (DIVERSEY CORP) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |