EP1277208 - A METHOD FOR RECONSTRUCTION OF AUDIO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kauppinen, Ismo Sukkulakuja 2 B 59 20100 Turku / FI | For all designated states Kauppinen, Jyrki Kyypellontie 1 21350 Ilmarinen / FI | [2003/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Maskula, Silla Marjatta, et al Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Maskula, Silla Marjatta, et al Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | ||
Former [2003/04] | Heikkilä, Hannes Antero Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | Application number, filing date | 01917133.9 | 05.03.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001FI00213 | Priority number, date | FI20000000523 | 07.03.2000 Original published format: FI 20000523 | [2003/04] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0167451 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1277208 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
G10L19/005 (EP);
G11B20/1876 (EP);
G11B20/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REKONSTRUKTION EINES AUDIOSIGNALS | [2003/04] | English: | A METHOD FOR RECONSTRUCTION OF AUDIO SIGNAL | [2003/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECONSTITUTION D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2001 | Translation filed | 16.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 20.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/35] | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0336685 ; | [A]EP0766247 ; | [A]JPS6386163 | [A] - WALTER ETTER, "Restoration of a discrete-time signal segment by interpolation based on the left-sided and right-sided autoregressive parameters", IEEE TRANSACTION ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (199605), vol. 44, no. 5, pages 1124 - 1135, XP000598076 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.502326 | [A] - S. MONTRESOR, J.C. VALIERE, M. BAUDRY, "Detection et suppression de bruits impulsionnels apliiques a la restauration d' enregistrements anciens", COLLOQUE DE PHYSIQUE TOME 51, C2, (199902), vol. II, pages C2-757 - C2-760, XP000865640 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP63086163 A 19880902 (TOSHIBA CORP) |