14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
02.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
22.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
10.12.2004 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
01.10.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] |
25.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
11.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
07.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |
10.10.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
04.10.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.10.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.05.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.05.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
08.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.10.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] |
25.10.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] |
04.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|