Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7381455 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2008 | B2 | US2007082160 | 12.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | US22172802 | 05.12.2002 | US29859205 | 12.12.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003526581 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4426401 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1263569 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2005 | B9 | EP1263569 | 26.11.2003 | B1 | EP1263569 | 11.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE254997T | 15.12.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2402540 | 20.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60101318D1 | 08.01.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60101318T | 21.07.2005 | T4 | DE60101318T | 19.08.2004 | T2 | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1263569T | 17.05.2005 | T5 | DK1263569T | 05.04.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA02009078 | 05.04.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003194521 | 16.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0100800 | 16.03.2001 | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0168355 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1321804C | 20.06.2007 | C | CN1427768 | 02.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2211787T | 16.07.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2806385 | 06.12.2002 | B1 | FR2806385 | 21.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2266203 | 20.12.2005 | C2 | RU2002124864 | 20.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0003469 | 17.03.2000 |