EP1263569 - FLEXIBLE TUBE, RESISTANT TO STRESS CRACKING AND IMPERMEABLE TO WATER VAPOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEP Industrie ZI du Tiennon 63550 Saint-Rémy-sur-Durolle / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states CEP Industrie ZI du Tiennon 63550 Saint Rémy sur Durolle / FR | ||
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states CEP Industrie ZI du Tiennon 63550 Saint Remy sur Durolle / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMBRICOURT, Géry La Verchère F-63300 Escoutoux / FR | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Berger, Helmut Cabinet Madeuf 10 avenue Marc Sangnier 92390 Villeneuve-la-Garenne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Berger, Helmut Cabinet Madeuf, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01917170.1 | 16.03.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001FR00800 | Priority number, date | FR20000003469 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: FR 0003469 | [2002/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0168355 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1263569 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1263569 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/48] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1263569 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29D23/20, B29C45/36, B65D35/08 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
B29C45/36 (EP,US);
B29C45/0046 (EP,US);
B65D35/08 (EP,US);
B29C2045/2714 (EP,US);
B29C45/2708 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0067 (EP,US);
B29L2023/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1397 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER BEHÄLTER, SPANNUNGSRISSBESTÄNDIG UND WASSERDAMPFUNDURCHLÄSSIG | [2002/50] | English: | FLEXIBLE TUBE, RESISTANT TO STRESS CRACKING AND IMPERMEABLE TO WATER VAPOUR | [2002/50] | French: | TUBE SOUPLE, RESISTANT A LA FISSURATION SOUS CONTRAINTE ET IMPERMEABLE A LA VAPEUR D'EAU | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 03.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2003 | CY | 26.11.2003 | FI | 26.11.2003 | TR | 26.11.2003 | GR | 26.02.2004 | LU | 16.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | PT | 26.04.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
TR | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 16.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
TR | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 16.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 16.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 26.11.2003 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4959005 (SORENSEN JENS O [US]) [Y] 4-6,8,9 * column 4, line 37 - column 7, line 45 * * column 9, line 13 - line 18 * * claims 1-29 * * figures 1-8 * [A] 1; | [A]US5174941 (SORENSEN JENS O [US]) [A] 1,4,6,8,9 * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 36 * * column 4, line 18 - line 29 * * figures 3,4 *; | [XA]EP0595220 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,12-14 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 16 * * page 5, line 39 - line 47 * * page 7, line 36 - line 4 * * claims 1,2,4,5 * [A] 10,11,16,17; | [DXY]EP0856554 (OREAL [FR]) [DX] 1-3,10-17 * column 2, line 12 - column 5, line 44 * * claims 1-16 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 4-6,8,9; | [A]FR2764230 (CARNAUDMETALBOX SANTE BEAUTE [FR]) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 35 ** figure 1 * |