EP1269182 - CAPTURE ASSAY UTILISING A PARTICULATE ANALYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genosis Limited 12-50 Kingsgate Road Kingston-upon-Thames KT2 5AA / GB | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITING, Karen, British Biocell International Ltd Ty Glas Avenue Cardiff CF4 5DX / GB | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/01] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01917297.2 | 02.04.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001GB01509 | Priority number, date | GB20000008124 | 03.04.2000 Original published format: GB 0008124 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0175434 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1269182 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1269182 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP,US);
Y10S435/805 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10S436/81 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINFANG TEST UNTER VERWENDUNG VON PARTIKULÄREM ANALYT | [2003/01] | English: | CAPTURE ASSAY UTILISING A PARTICULATE ANALYTE | [2003/01] | French: | DOSAGE EN CAPTIVITE UTILISANT UN ANALYTE PARTICULAIRE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 02.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2004 | BE | 01.12.2004 | CH | 01.12.2004 | FI | 01.12.2004 | IT | 01.12.2004 | LI | 01.12.2004 | NL | 01.12.2004 | TR | 01.12.2004 | DK | 01.03.2005 | GR | 01.03.2005 | SE | 01.03.2005 | ES | 12.03.2005 | CY | 02.04.2005 | LU | 02.04.2005 | IE | 04.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | PT | 01.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
IT | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
SE | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
CY | 02.04.2005 | ||
LU | 02.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
SE | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
CY | 02.04.2005 | ||
LU | 02.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
SE | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
CY | 02.04.2005 | ||
LU | 02.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
SE | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
CY | 02.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
SE | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 01.12.2004 | |
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 01.12.2004 | |
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 01.12.2004 | |
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 01.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0143412 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2721112 (GKS TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-14 *; | [XP]WO0020866 (GENOSIS LTD [GB], et al) [XP] 1-10* the whole document * |