EP1185788 - ENGINE IDLE STOP CONTROL SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUSE, Toru 3-4710-1, Soubudai Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-0011 / JP | 02 /
NAKAZAWA, Takashi 3-33-23-309, Ida, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0035 / JP | 03 /
NAGAISHI, Hatsuo 4-104, 1948-12, Mutsuura-cho, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0032 / JP | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Weber, Joachim, Dr., et al Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01917756.7 | 30.03.2001 | [2002/11] | WO2001JP02826 | Priority number, date | JP20000110424 | 12.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000110424 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0177519 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185788 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1185788 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/08 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
B60K6/543 (EP,US);
F02N11/08 (KR);
F02D17/00 (KR);
F02D41/065 (EP,US);
F02N11/04 (EP,US);
F02N11/0818 (EP,US);
F02D2250/18 (EP,US);
F02D41/042 (EP,US);
F02N2200/0802 (EP,US);
F02N2200/101 (EP,US);
F02N2300/104 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | LEERLAUFSTOPPREGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2002/11] | English: | ENGINE IDLE STOP CONTROL SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES | [2002/11] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'ARRET EN POSITION DE RALENTI DU MOTEUR, POUR VEHICULES | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 14.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]JPH08291725 ; | [A]EP0989299 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 19 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08291725 A 19961105 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [DA] * abstract * |