EP1282616 - HYDROXYPHENYL-PIPERIDIN-4-YLIDENE-METHYL-BENZAMIDE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATEMENT OF PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2003/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, William AstraZeneca R & D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 02 /
WALPOLE, Christopher AstraZeneca R & D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 03 /
WEI, Zhongyong AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 1Z9 / CA | [2003/07] | Application number, filing date | 01918113.0 | 30.03.2001 | [2003/07] | WO2001SE00707 | Priority number, date | SE20000001207 | 04.04.2000 Original published format: SE 0001207 | [2003/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0174804 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1282616 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1282616 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D405/06, C07D409/06, C07D211/68, A61K31/4523, A61P25/04, A61P25/00 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/445 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
C07D211/70 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/07] | Extension states | AL | 04.11.2002 | LT | 04.11.2002 | LV | 04.11.2002 | MK | 04.11.2002 | RO | 04.11.2002 | SI | 04.11.2002 | Title | German: | HYDROXYPHENYL-PIPERIDIN-4-YLIDENE-METHYL-BENZAMIDDERIVATE ZUR SCHMERZBEKÄMPFUNG | [2003/07] | English: | HYDROXYPHENYL-PIPERIDIN-4-YLIDENE-METHYL-BENZAMIDE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATEMENT OF PAIN | [2003/07] | French: | DERIVES D'HYDROXYPHENYL-PIPERIDINE-4-YLIDENE-METHYL-BENZAMIDE UTILISES COMME ANALGESIQUES | [2003/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 04.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9723466 (ASTRA PHARMA INC [CA], et al); | [X]WO9828275 (ASTRA PHARMA INC [CA], et al); | [X]WO9933806 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US], et al); | [X] - XIAOYAN ZHANG ET AL., "Probes for narcotic receptor mediated phenomena. 26. 1-3 Synthesis and biological evaluation of diarylmethylpiperazines and diarylmethylpiperidines as novel, nonpeptidic delta opioid receptor ligands", J. MED. CHEM., (1999), vol. 42, pages 5455 - 5463, XP002943072 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9903895 | [X] - ZHONG-YONG WEI ET AL., "N,N-Diethyl-4-(phenylpiperidin-4-ylidenemethyl) benzamide: A novel, exceptionally selective, potent delta opioid receptor agonist with oral biovailability and its analogues", J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 3895 - 3905, XP002943073 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm000229p |