EP1274470 - IMPLANT PROVIDED WITH ATTACHMENT AND HOLE-INSERT PARTS, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH AN IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nobel Biocare Services AG Postfach 8058 Zürich-Flughafen / CH | [2013/25] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Nobel Biocare Services AG Postfach 8058 Zürich-Flughafen / CH | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Nobel Biocare AB (publ) Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, Jan Stabbegatan 2A S-416 80 Göteborg / SE | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Axelsson, Stig Torbjörn, et al Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | [2014/07] |
Former [2012/40] | Roman Ekstedt, Måns Nobel Biocare AB P.O. Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2011/34] | Davies, Dominic Jack, et al Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Byström, Kurt Linus, et al Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2003/03] | Olsson, Gunnar Nobel Biocare AB (publ), Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 01918126.2 | 03.04.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001SE00728 | Priority number, date | SE20000001202 | 04.04.2000 Original published format: SE 0001202 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0176653 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274470 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1274470 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/28 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
A61C8/0022 (EP,US);
A61C2008/0046 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30011 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30321 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30859 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30871 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30873 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30925 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0023 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0025 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Title | German: | IMPLANTAT AUSGESTATTET MIT BEREICHEN ZUR FIXIERUNG UND LÖCHERN ZUM FÜLLEN SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SOLCHER IMPLANTATE | [2003/03] | English: | IMPLANT PROVIDED WITH ATTACHMENT AND HOLE-INSERT PARTS, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH AN IMPLANT | [2003/03] | French: | IMPLANT MUNI DE MOYENS DE FIXATION ET D'INSERTION DANS DES TROUS ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 04.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 02.01.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 26.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 04.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.06.2013 | CY | 19.06.2013 | DK | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | GR | 20.09.2013 | PT | 21.10.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/52] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 29.04.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | IT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 29.04.2013 | ||
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 29.04.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
GR | 20.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8100808 (KNIGHT M); | [A]US4351069 (BALLINTYN NICOLAAS J, et al); | [A]FR2628629 (VEROLA JEAN [FR]); | [A]US5489306 (GORSKI JERROLD M [US]); | [A]US5723038 (SCHARNWEBER DIETER [DE], et al); | [A]WO9932204 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) |