EP1263503 - USE OF CYANOQUINOLINES FOR TREATING OR INHIBITING COLONIC POLYPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Holdings Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [2003/18] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROST, Philip 4 Emerson Court Morris Township, NJ 07960 / US | 02 /
DISCAFANI-MARRO, Carolyn, M. 8 Brookside Avenue Cortlandt Manor, NY 10567 / US | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Wileman, David Francis Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Wileman, David Francis Dr. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01918367.2 | 06.03.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001US07068 | Priority number, date | US20000524196 | 13.03.2000 Original published format: US 524196 | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0168186 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1263503 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1263503 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61P1/00, A61K31/4706, A61K31/4709 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP);
A61K31/47 (EP,KR);
A61K31/4706 (EP);
A61K31/4709 (EP);
A61K31/4741 (EP);
A61K31/517 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Extension states | AL | 21.08.2002 | LT | 21.08.2002 | LV | 21.08.2002 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 21.08.2002 | SI | 21.08.2002 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CYANOCHINOLINEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER INHIBIERUNG VON DICKDARMPOLYPEN | [2002/50] | English: | USE OF CYANOQUINOLINES FOR TREATING OR INHIBITING COLONIC POLYPS | [2002/50] | French: | ULISATION DE CYANOQUINOLINES POUR TRAITER OU EMPECHER DES POLYPES DU COLON | [2005/15] |
Former [2002/50] | THERAPIE ET PROPHYLAXIE DES POLYPES DU COLON | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 02.11.2005 | |
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | MC | 31.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9843960 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [X] 1-20 * claims 1,27,39 *; | [X]US6002008 (WISSNER ALLAN [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * claim - *; | [PX]WO0112227 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [PX] 1-20* claims 1,7-15 * |