EP1268710 - PROCESS FOR REMOVING SULFUR COMPOUNDS FROM GAS AND LIQUID HYDROCARBON STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | [2006/09] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAKKA, Leo, Ernest 48 Browning Drive Dollard Des Ormeaux, Quebec H9G 2K4 / CA | 02 /
FORTE, Paulino 82 Homecrest Oval Yonkers, NY 10703 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01918469.6 | 09.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US07518 | Priority number, date | US20000521654 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: US 521654 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0166671 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1268710 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268710 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C10G21/27, C10G21/28, C10L3/10 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
C10G21/27 (EP,US);
C10G21/28 (EP,US);
C10L3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON SCHWEFELVERBINDUNGEN AUS GAS UND FLÜSSIGEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFBESCHICKUNGEN | [2003/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR REMOVING SULFUR COMPOUNDS FROM GAS AND LIQUID HYDROCARBON STREAMS | [2003/01] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXTRACTION DE COMPOSES DE SOUFRE DE FLUX D'HYDROCARBURES LIQUIDES ET GAZEUX | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 28.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2006 | CH | 01.03.2006 | CY | 01.03.2006 | FI | 01.03.2006 | LI | 01.03.2006 | TR | 01.03.2006 | IE | 09.03.2006 | LU | 09.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | DK | 01.06.2006 | SE | 01.06.2006 | GR | 02.06.2006 | PT | 01.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
TR | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 09.03.2006 | ||
LU | 09.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 09.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 09.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 09.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 09.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5093094 (VAN KLEECK DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5-17; | [Y]US5149880 (SAWYER DONALD T [US], et al) [Y] 5-17* Abstract;; claims 1-6 * |