EP1280953 - THREAD TAIL CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L & P Property Management Company 4095 Firestone Boulevard South Gate, CA 90280 / US | [2003/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAREY, Snead, Henry, Jr. 1443 Old Allensville Rd. Roxbro, NC 27573 / US | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01918573.5 | 13.03.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001US07853 | Priority number, date | US20000523867 | 14.03.2000 Original published format: US 523867 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0168968 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1280953 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D05B1/00 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
D05B11/00 (EP,US);
D05B29/06 (EP,US);
D05B65/00 (EP,US);
D05D2207/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON FÄDEN | [2003/06] | English: | THREAD TAIL CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2003/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET METHODE D'EXTRACTION D'UNE EXTREMITE DE FIL | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/20] | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3371632 (JAMES SNYDER C, et al); | [X]US3614935 (CONTI CESARE L); | [A]US3922983 (SCHIPS HELMUT, et al); | [X]US4328758 (SOUZA RONALD, et al); | [A]US5655470 (TAJIMA IKUO [JP], et al); | [A]US5927221 (PORTER MICHAEL R [US], et al) |