|
14.03.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2008 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2008 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2006 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Communication about possibility to obtain an European search report after lack of unity of the international application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
176 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.10.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.10.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.2002 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Refund of fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.10.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.10.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
171 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
146 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
5 |