22.01.2021 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
07.05.2010 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] |
27.03.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
09.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
11.11.2008 |
Deletion: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
29.10.2008 |
Deletion: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
21.10.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
16.10.2008 |
Change: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
30.05.2008 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
18.04.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.02.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.11.2007 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
30.11.2007 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
30.11.2007 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
02.10.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.04.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2006 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2005 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
02.08.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.07.2005 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
29.06.2005 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
01.04.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.08.2004 |
First examination report |
|
11.08.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
02.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.01.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.11.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
01.11.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
18.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|