EP1255986 - AN END ELEMENT FOR CAPILLARIES OR CHIP CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evotec OAI AG Schnackenburgallee 114 22525 Hamburg / DE | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Dagmar Nettelbeckstr. 3 22761 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
MUSCATE-MAGNUSSEN, Angelika Prahlstrasse 1-3 22765 Hamburg / DE | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2002/46] | von Kirschbaum, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01919288.9 | 16.02.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001EP01733 | Priority number, date | EP20000103517 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: EP 00103517 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0161338 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255986 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/56, G01N30/60, G01N27/447 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
G01N27/44704 (EP,US);
G01N27/44791 (EP,US);
G01N30/56 (EP,US);
G01N30/603 (EP,US);
G01N30/6047 (EP,US);
H01J49/165 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/46] | Title | German: | ENDSTÜCK FÜR KAPILLARE ODER CHIPKANÄLE | [2002/46] | English: | AN END ELEMENT FOR CAPILLARIES OR CHIP CHANNELS | [2002/46] | French: | ELEMENT TERMINAL POUR CAPILLAIRES OU CANAUX DE PUCE | [2002/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPH02238362 [ ]; | [X]JPH02238362 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-9,12-17 * figure - *; | [X]DE9016515U (MACHEREY, NAGEL & CO) [X] 1,2,10,12-17 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1; figure . *; | [X]EP0512394 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [X] 7-9,11,16,17 * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 1; figure 2 *; | [X]US5223226 (WITTMER DOUGLAS P [US], et al) [X] 7-9,11,16,17 * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 22; figures 1A,1B,2,6 *; | [A]DE29905802U (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-3,5-7,10,12-17 * page 9, line 11 - page 12, line 15; figure - *; | [X]US5985140 (DEWAELE CHRIS [BE]) [X] 1-8,12-17 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 25; figure - *; | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900920), vol. 14, no. 558, Database accession no. (P - 1141), & JP02238362 A 00000000 (...) [ ] * abstract * | [A] - BOUGHTFLOWER R J ET AL, "Capillary electrochromatography - some important considerations in the preparation of packed capillaries and the choice of mobile phase buffers", CHROMATOGRAPHIA, ISSN 0009-5893, (199503), vol. 40, no. 5/6, pages 329 - 335, XP000576310 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02290365 |