EP1269069 - INSTALLATION FOR TREATING BOTTLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autefa Automation GmbH Röntgenstrasse 1-5 86316 Friedberg / DE | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRSCHEK, Herwig Keplerstrasse 3a 86399 Bobingen / DE | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al Ernicke & Ernicke Beim Glaspalast 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01919329.1 | 23.02.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001EP02040 | Priority number, date | DE2000203626U | 29.02.2000 Original published format: DE 20003626 U | DE2000215199U | 02.09.2000 Original published format: DE 20015199 U | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0164007 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1269069 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1269069 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1269069 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16S1/00 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B65G47/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/32] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FLASCHENBEHANDLUNGSANLAGE | [2003/01] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR TREATING BOTTLES | [2003/01] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE BOUTEILLES | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 20.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO9955604 (CERTUS MASCHBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1,5 * page 20, line 12 - page 21, line 4; figure 1 * [A] 3; | [Y]GB699100 (EUGENE HAYWARD) [Y] 1,5 * page 1, line 69 - page 1, line 71; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4373642 (WOLTERS RICHARD H, et al) [A] 1,2,5,6 * figures 1,8 *; | [A]GB825943 (WILFRED CLARK) [A] 7 * page 2, line 37 - page 2, line 44; figure 3 *; | [A]DE3926650 (CERTUS MASCHBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 4,8 * column 3, line 17 - column 3, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2740262 (WAVIN BV) [A] 1,5,7 * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE29911935U (DELBROUCK FRANZ GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,7 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE4000186 (PRIVAT BRAUEREIEN NIES GMBH [DE]) [A] 7 * figures 1-3 * |