|
22.11.2011 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
22.01.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
22.01.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
22.01.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.01.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.11.2002 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
14 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.05.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.05.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.11.2001 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.11.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.11.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
30 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |