25.11.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
05.08.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.12.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
18.06.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
30.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.05.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
30.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
09.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.11.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
22.11.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
20.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
26.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|