Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7262009 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2007 | B2 | US2003203374 | 30.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0101619 | 10.04.2001 | GB0008787 | 10.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4340734B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2009 | B2 | JP2003530118 | 14.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0101619 | 10.04.2001 | GB0008787 | 10.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4671201 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0101619 | 10.04.2001 | GB0008787 | 10.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2001246712C | Global Dossier | 02.08.2007 | C1 | AU2001246712B | 19.10.2006 | B2 | Priority number | Date | GB0101619 | 10.04.2001 | GB0008787 | 10.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1272664 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0101619 | 10.04.2001 | GB0008787 | 10.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2405769 | 18.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0101619 | 10.04.2001 | GB0008787 | 10.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20024879L | 10.12.2002 | L | NO20024879D0 | 09.10.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0101619 | 10.04.2001 | GB0008787 | 10.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0177379 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2002 | A3 | WO0177379 | 18.10.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0008787 | 10.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0008787D0 | 31.05.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0008787 | 10.04.2000 |