EP1277714 - HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKAWA, Shuichi, NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
TOMITA, Takahiro, NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI, Shinji, NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 04 /
SAKAI, Hiroaki, NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01919898.5 | 12.04.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001JP03140 | Priority number, date | JP20000113513 | 14.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000113513 | JP20000337936 | 06.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000337936 | JP20010032699 | 08.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001032699 | [2003/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0179138 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1277714 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1277714 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/565 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
B01D46/2429 (EP,US);
B01D46/247 (EP,US);
B01D46/24491 (EP,US);
B01D46/24492 (EP,US);
B01D46/24494 (EP,US);
B01D46/2474 (EP,US);
B01D46/2482 (EP,US);
B01D46/2484 (EP,US);
B01D46/2498 (EP,US);
B01D53/94 (EP,US);
B01D53/9454 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
C04B32/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/638 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00198 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3826 (EP,US);
C04B2235/428 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/61 (EP,US);
C04B2235/668 (EP,US);
C04B2235/728 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B32/00, C04B14/322, C04B14/34, C04B38/0006, C04B38/06 (US,EP);
C04B38/0006, C04B14/34, C04B35/565, C04B38/0009, C04B38/06 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006, C04B35/565, C04B38/0009, C04B38/0038, C04B38/0054 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [2004/22] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WABENFÖRMIGE STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [2003/04] | English: | HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE | [2003/04] | French: | STRUCTURE EN NID D'ABEILLE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2002 | Translation filed | 04.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.12.2009 | [2010/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08281036 ; | [XY]US4777152 (TSUKADA KIYOTAKA [JP]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 10 - line 33 * * column 2, line 28 - line 38 * * column 3, line 36 - line 62 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 2 * [Y] 2-4,7,8; | [Y]EP0322998 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-4 * page 3, line 1 - line 25 * * page 4, line 11 - line 22 * * example 1 *; | [A]US4902459 (MATSUBARA SABURO [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * column 4, line 33 - line 49 ** column 5, line 12 - line 15 *; | [XY]EP0369330 (NORTON CO [US]) [X] 1-24 * page 2, line 5 - line 8 * * page 2, line 57 - page 3, line 1 * * page 3, line 9 - line 12 * * page 3, line 28 - line 52 * * page 4, line 1 - line 19 * * page 4, line 56 - line 57 * * claim - * [Y] 7,8; | [A]US5356720 (CREBER DAVID K [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * column 5, line 4 - line 13 * * column 6, line 49 - line 58 * * column 10, line 10 - line 18 * * claims 1,6,7,18,20 * * column 29, line 19 - line 25 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08281036 A 19961029 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * JP 08 281036 A: cf. [0001], [0007], [0008], [0013], [0015], [0017]-[0019], * | International search | [X]JPS60255671 (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [A]JPH01172290 (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [Y]JPH01192764 (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [A]JPH03126670 (EAGLE IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0985038 (TOKAI KONETSU KOGYO KK) |