EP1195398 - LIQUID-CRYSTAL POLYESTER RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA UENO SEIYAKU OYO KENKYUSHO 4-8, Koraibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8543 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA UENO SEIYAKU OYO KENKYUSHO 4-8, Koraibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8543 / JP | ||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA UENO SEIYAKU OYO KENKYUSHO 4-8, Koraibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8543 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Ryuzo 10-27, Nangocho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0038 / JP | 02 /
KITAYAMA, Masaya 3-76, Yamamotohigashi Takaraduka-shi, Hyogo 665-0881 / JP | 03 /
KOMETANI, Kiichi 2-19, Masumi-cho Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-0041 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Hiroyuki 6-3, Higashiunenoyamate 1-chome Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-0114 / JP | 05 /
UEDA, Kazunori 2-15-9-301, Miza Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0834 / JP | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01919953.8 | 16.04.2001 | [2002/15] | WO2001JP03242 | Priority number, date | JP20000119762 | 20.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000119762 | [2002/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0181449 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1195398 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1195398 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/02, C08G63/60, C08K3/00 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
C08G63/065 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/44 (KR);
B29B7/002 (EP);
B29B7/286 (EP);
B29B7/726 (EP);
B29B7/90 (EP);
B29B9/12 (EP);
C08G63/605 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/3809 (KR);
B29B9/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/15] | C08G63/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/15] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLINES POLYESTERHARZ | [2002/15] | English: | LIQUID-CRYSTAL POLYESTER RESIN | [2002/15] | French: | RESINE POLYESTER A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2002/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2001 | Translation filed | 21.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 18.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.2005 | BE | 12.10.2005 | CY | 12.10.2005 | FI | 12.10.2005 | NL | 12.10.2005 | TR | 12.10.2005 | DK | 12.01.2006 | GR | 12.01.2006 | SE | 12.01.2006 | ES | 23.01.2006 | PT | 13.03.2006 | LU | 16.04.2006 | IE | 17.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 16.04.2006 | ||
IE | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
IE | 17.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 12.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [D]JP8511573T ; | [X]EP0380286 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * page 3, line 32 - line 44; claims 1-4 * * page 4, line 3 - line 8 *; | [A]WO9429366 (DU PONT [US]) | International search | [A]US5198572 (WHITE DWAIN M [US], et al) |