EP1261744 - ESTROGEN RECEPTOR BETA VARIANTS AND METHODS OF DETECTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applera Corporation 301 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states APPLERA CORPORATION 301 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states PE Corporation (NY) 761 Main Avenue Norwalk, CT 06859 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALUSH, Francis c/o Celera, 45 West Gude Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 02 /
CASSEL, Michael, J. c/o Celera, 45 West Gude Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
HWANG, Stuart, Soo-In c/o Celera, 45 West Gude Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 04 /
WINN-DEEN, Emily, S. c/o Celera, 45 West Gude Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01920119.3 | 20.02.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001US05360 | Priority number, date | US20000183755P | 22.02.2000 Original published format: US 183755 P | US20010768185 | 24.01.2001 Original published format: US 768185 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0162793 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1261744 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, C12N5/10 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K14/70567 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÖSTROGENREZEPTOR BETA VARIANTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION DERSELBEN | [2002/49] | English: | ESTROGEN RECEPTOR BETA VARIANTS AND METHODS OF DETECTION THEREOF | [2002/49] | French: | VARIANTES DU RECEPTEUR BETA D'OESTROGENES ET LEURS PROCEDES DE DETECTION | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - ROSENKRANZ K ET AL., "Systematic mutation screening of the estrogen receptor beta gene in probands of different weight extremes: Identification of several generic variants", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1998), vol. 83, no. 12, pages 4524 - 4527, XP001023182 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.83.12.4524 | [A] - ALBAGHA O ET AL., "Estrogen receptor -alpha and -beta gene polymorphisms and osteoporosis: A population based study", CALCIFIED TISSUE INTERNATIONAL, (1999), vol. 64, no. Sup1, page S86, XP001023177 [A] * abstract * | [A] - TSUKAMOTO K ET AL., "Isolation and radiation hybrid mapping of dinucleotide repeat polymorphisms at the human estrogen receptor beta locus.", JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (1998), vol. 43, no. 1, pages 73 - 74, XP001023178 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s100380050043 | [DA] - MOSSELMAN S ET AL., "ERbeta: Identification and characterization of a novel human estrogen receptor", FEBS LETTERS, (1996), vol. 392, pages 49 - 53, XP002175602 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(96)00782-X |