EP1259595 - INTEGRIN ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunex Corporation 1201 Amgen Court West Seattle, WA 91119-3105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states IMMUNEX CORPORATION 1201 Amgen Court West Seattle, WA 91119-3105 / US | ||
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states IMMUNEX CORPORATION 1201 Amgen Court West Seattle, WA 98119-3105 / US | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states IMMUNEX CORPORATION 51 University Street Seattle Washington 98101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANSLOW, William, C., III 404 S.W. 197th Street Normandy Park, WA 98166 / US | 02 /
CERRETTI, Douglas, Pat 1607 North 197th Place Seattle, WA 98133 / US | 03 /
POINDEXTER, Kurt, Matthew 9247 Interlake Avenue North, Apt. 2 Seattle, WA 98103 / US | 04 /
BLACK, Roy, Alvin 8062 30th Avenue Northeast Seattle, WA 98115 / US | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01920133.4 | 23.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001US05701 | Priority number, date | US20000184865P | 25.02.2000 Original published format: US 184865 P | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0162905 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1259595 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259595 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/64, C12N15/57, A61K38/16, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P27/00, A61P17/02 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
C12N9/6489 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIN ANTAGONISTEN | [2002/48] | English: | INTEGRIN ANTAGONISTS | [2002/48] | French: | ANTAGONISTES DES INTEGRINES | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06026259.9 / EP1803810 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | BE | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | ES | 15.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 04.04.2007 | |
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 15.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9923228 (IMMUNEX CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1-42 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [DA]WO9936549 (IMMUNEX CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1-42 * page 4, line 24 - line 30 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 26 *; | [AD]WO9941388 (IMMUNEX CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0043493 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-9,11-29,31,32,34-42 * page 13, line 3 * * page 17, line 6 - line 7 * * page 196, line 31 - page 204, line 33 * * page 227 - page 234 * * examples 10,39,41-43,49 *; | [E]WO0174857 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [E] 1-18,20,27,28,30-42 * page 4, line 26 - page 6, line 16 * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 26 ** page 14, line 17 - line 34; example 12 *; | [X] - SCHLUESENER HERMANN J, "The disintegrin domain of ADAM 8 enhances protection against rat experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis, neuritis and uveitis by a polyvalent autoantigen vaccine.", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, (19980701), vol. 87, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 197 - 202, XP000926791 [X] 1-3,16,17,26 * page 199 - page 201; figure 2A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-5728(98)00080-0 | [DXAY] - NATH DEEPA ET AL, "Interaction of metargidin (ADAM-15) with alphavbeta3 and alpha5beta1 integrins on different haemopoietic cells.", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, LONDON GB, (199902), vol. 112, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 579 - 587, XP002186267 [DX] 1-3,7-18,27,31,33-41 * the whole document, especially page 586, column 1 * [A] 35-42 [Y] 4 | [X] - ZHANG XI-PING ET AL, "Specific interaction of the recombinant disintegrin-like domain of MDC-15 (metargidin, ADAM-15) with integrin alphavbeta3.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (19980327), vol. 273, no. 13, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 7345 - 7350, XP002186268 [X] 1-3,9-18,27,31,33 * the whole document, especially page 7349, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.13.7345 | [Y] - SHEU J-R ET AL, "Inhibition of angiogenesis in vitro and in vivo: comparison of the relative activities of triflavin, an Arg-Gly-Asp-containing peptide and anti-alphavbeta3 integrin monoclonal antibody", BBA - GENERAL SUBJECTS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (19971020), vol. 1336, no. 3, ISSN 0304-4165, pages 445 - 454, XP004276037 [Y] 4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4165(97)00057-3 | [Y] - TSELEPIS VICKY H ET AL, "An RGD to LDV motif conversion within the disintegrin kistrin generates an integrin antagonist that retains potency but exhibits altered receptor specificity: Evidence for a functional equivalence of acidic integrin-binding motifs", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (1997), vol. 272, no. 34, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 21341 - 21348, XP002149905 [Y] 4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.34.21341 |