EP1266415 - NOVEL ALKALINE FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 1675 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 1675 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OVSHINSKY, Stanford, R. 2700 Squirrel Road Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 / US | 02 /
VENKATESAN, Srinivasan 30115 Woodgate Drive Southfield, MI 48076 / US | 03 /
ALADJOV, Boyko 1415 Brians Way Rochester Hills, MI 48037 / US | 04 /
YOUNG, Rosa 4136 Golf Ridge Drive East Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302 / US | 05 /
HOPPER, Thomas 9902 Hendrickson Clawson, MI 48017 / US | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2002/51] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 01920306.6 | 13.03.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001US07864 | Priority number, date | US20000524116 | 13.03.2000 Original published format: US 524116 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0169701 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266415 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/86, H01M8/00, H01M4/58, C01B6/24 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
H01M8/186 (EP,US);
H01M4/86 (EP,KR,US);
B60L50/72 (EP,US);
B60L58/31 (EP,US);
B60L7/18 (EP,US);
C01B13/02 (EP,US);
C01B3/0031 (EP,US);
H01M4/8615 (EP,US);
H01M8/08 (EP,US);
B60L2240/36 (EP,US);
H01M2004/8684 (EP,US);
H01M2004/8689 (EP,US);
H01M8/065 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | NEUE ALKALI-BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2002/51] | English: | NOVEL ALKALINE FUEL CELL | [2002/51] | French: | NOUVELLE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE ALCALINE | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0277332 (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * column 1, line 35 - line 41 * * column 2, line 26 - line 33 * * column 2, line 40 - line 46 *; | [X]EP0736921 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-2,10 * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * column 2, line 19 - line 20 *; | [X]US5841043 (NISHIMURA KOUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-4,6-9 * column 2, line 37 - line 40 * * column 5, line 27 - line 29 * * column 7, line 11 - line 15 * * example 7 * * column 12, line 28 - line 35 *; | [XP]US6156453 (SHIMIZU TETSUO [JP], et al) [XP] 1-4,6-10 * column 2, line 31 - line 35 * * column 2, line 52 - line 54 * * column 8, line 28 - line 30 ** examples 1-3 *; | [E]WO0134861 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]) [E] 1-4,10 * page 24, line 3 - line 15 * * claims 10-12 * | International search | [X]US5599640 (LEE JAI Y [KR], et al) |