EP1290424 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING PARTICLES IN A GAS FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOYEN CONTROLS CO. PTY. LIMITED 268-292 Milperra Road Milperra, NSW 2214 / AU | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROE, Anthony, Morris 3 Kernow Street Robertson, QLD 4109 / AU | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2003/11] | Jones, David Colin, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01921036.8 | 11.04.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001AU00417 | Priority number, date | AU2000PQ06859 | 12.04.2000 Original published format: AU PQ685900 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0179811 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1290424 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/06, G01N27/60 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
G01N27/60 (EP,US);
G01N15/0656 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION VON PARTIKELN IN EINER GASSTRÖMUNG | [2008/12] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING PARTICLES IN A GAS FLOW | [2003/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA DETECTION DE PARTICULES DANS UN FLUX DE GAZ | [2003/11] |
Former [2003/11] | "VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON PARTIKELN IN EINER GASSTRVMUNG | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 11.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/03] | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9926055 (CGIA [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,20,21 * abstract *[A] 4 | International search | [A]US4117715 (HOENIG STUART A); | [A]DE2854657 (MAGYAR TUDOMANYOS AKADEMIA); | [A]US4179934 (SVAROVSKY LADISLAV [GB]); | [A]US4531402 (REIF ROBERT B [US], et al); | [A]US4607228 (REIF ROBERT B [US]); | [A]US4631482 (NEWTON ROBERT E [US], et al); | [A]US4904944 (DECHENE RONALD L [US], et al); | [A]US5095275 (DECHENE RONALD L [US], et al); | [A]WO9423281 (POLLUTION CONTROL AND MEASUREM [GB], et al); | [A]US5448172 (DECHENE RONALD L [US], et al); | [A]US5591895 (RIGBY MICHAEL [GB]); | [A]US5644241 (HEWELT SCOTT M [US]); | [A]WO9905479 (PCME LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO9950641 (PCME LIMITED [GB], et al) |