EP1269779 - HANDLING OF A MESSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SmartTrust Systems Oy Elimäenkatu 17-19 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2007/28] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Smarttrust Systems Oy Elimäenkatu 17-19 00510 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄTTÖ, Mikko Jämeräntaival 5 B 216 FIN-02150 Espoo / FI | 02 /
LIUKKONEN, Jukka Männikkötie 9 G 53 FIN-00630 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
PIETILÄINEN, Henna Jämeräntaival 6 B 301 FIN-02150 Espoo / FI | 04 /
LEHTONEN, Veera Merimiehenkatu 39 B 42 FIN-00150 Helsinki / FI | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Söderman, Lisbeth Karin, et al Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Simmelvuo, Markku, et al Papula Oy, P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01921400.6 | 20.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001FI00279 | Priority number, date | FI20000000695 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: FI 20000695 | [2003/01] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178432 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1269779 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1269779 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04L9/32 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04W12/106 (EP,US);
H04W88/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDHABUNG EINER NACHRICHT | [2003/01] | English: | HANDLING OF A MESSAGE | [2003/01] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'UN MESSAGE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2001 | Translation filed | 22.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.07.2007 | BE | 11.07.2007 | CH | 11.07.2007 | CY | 11.07.2007 | DK | 11.07.2007 | FI | 11.07.2007 | LI | 11.07.2007 | NL | 11.07.2007 | TR | 11.07.2007 | DE | 12.10.2007 | GR | 12.10.2007 | ES | 22.10.2007 | PT | 11.12.2007 | FR | 07.03.2008 | IE | 20.03.2008 | LU | 20.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
TR | 11.07.2007 | ||
DE | 12.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2008 | ||
IE | 20.03.2008 | ||
LU | 20.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
DE | 12.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2008 | ||
IE | 20.03.2008 | ||
LU | 20.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
DE | 12.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2008 | ||
IE | 20.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
DE | 12.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2008 | ||
IE | 20.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
DE | 12.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
DE | 12.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 11.07.2007 | |
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 11.07.2007 | |
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 22.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9828877 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al); | [AP]WO0059244 (SONERA SMARTTRUST OY [FI], et al); | [X] - WARWICK FORD, Computer communications security, ENGLEWOOD CLIFFS, NEW JERSEY, PRENTICE HALL P T R, (1994), XP002957019 [X] * ISBN 0-13-799453-2; page 127 - page 130 * |