Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1221293
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.05.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] |
14.05.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
07.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.03.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.03.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.11.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.10.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.01.2003 |
First examination report |
|
11.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.09.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] |
24.05.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] |
24.05.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] |
07.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
31.01.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|