EP1221293 - DYED HAIR COLOR CHECKING MIRROR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI, Masahiko KAO CORPORATION, Research Labs. 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
ONITSUKA, Satoshi KAO CORPORATION, Research Labs. 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 03 /
ASANO, Mitsuo KAO CORPORATION, Research Labs. 1-3, Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01921994.8 | 23.04.2001 | [2002/28] | WO2001JP03447 | Priority number, date | JP20000123240 | 24.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000123240 | JP20000202523 | 04.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000202523 | [2002/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0180685 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1221293 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1221293 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A45D44/00 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
A45D44/005 (EP,US);
A45D19/0066 (EP,US);
A45D42/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/27] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SPIEGEL ZUR PRÜFUNG DER FARBE VON GEFÄRBTEN HAAREN | [2002/28] | English: | DYED HAIR COLOR CHECKING MIRROR | [2002/28] | French: | MIROIR SERVANT A VISUALISER LA COULEUR DES CHEVEUX TEINTS | [2002/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2002 | Translation filed | 07.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2000021 (STONELL M) [X] 1,4,7,8 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-28 * * page 1, lines 45-49 ** page 1, lines 81-99 * | International search | [A]JPS5998821U ; | [A]JPH0937846 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) |