EP1267988 - RETRIEVABLE SELF EXPANDING SHUNT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aga Medical Corporation 5050 Nathan Lane North Plymouth MN 55442-2204 / US | [2006/34] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Aga Medical Corporation 682 Mendelssohn Avenue Golden Valley, MN 55427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMPLATZ, Kurt 10 Evergreen Road St. Paul, MN 55127 / US | 02 /
AFREMOV, Michael 1664 Virginia Avenue South St. Louis Park, MN 55426 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01922330.4 | 12.03.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US07762 | Priority number, date | US20000535590 | 27.03.2000 Original published format: US 535590 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0172367 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1267988 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61M29/00 (KR);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1139 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1205 (EP,US);
A61F2/2493 (EP,US);
A61F2/90 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZURUCKZIEHBARER SELBSTEXPANDIERENDER SHUNT | [2003/01] | English: | RETRIEVABLE SELF EXPANDING SHUNT | [2003/01] | French: | SHUNT AUTO-EXPANSIBLE ET EXTRACTABLE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 03.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/13] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9912478 (AGA MEDICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-11* page 20, line 21 - page 21, line 7; figures 22-26 *; | [Y]US6007544 (KIM DUCKSOO [US]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5944738 (AMPLATZ KURT [US], et al) |