26.02.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
04.11.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.04.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.06.2007 |
First examination report |
|
05.06.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.01.2007 |
First examination report |
|
16.01.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.07.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
14.07.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.03.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] |
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.05.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
21.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.11.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
15.11.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
16.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2002 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|