EP1309912 - METHODS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR DYNAMIC SCHEDULING AND MATRIX COLLECTING OF DATA ABOUT SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Technology, LLC 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, MO 63167 / US | [2006/46] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Icoria, Inc. 108 Alexander Drive, P.O. Box 14528 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-4528 / US | ||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Paradigm Genetics Inc. 104 Alexander Drive, Bldg. 2, P.O. Box 14528 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-4528 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRETT, Thomas, H., Jr. 2105 Hillock Drive Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | 02 /
COREY, D., DeHaven 2744 Glastonbury Road Apex, NC 27502 / US | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Helbing, Jörg, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/20] | Kensett, John Hinton, et al Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01922712.3 | 27.03.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001US09726 | Priority number, date | US20000192496P | 28.03.2000 Original published format: US 192496 P | US20000192706P | 28.03.2000 Original published format: US 192706 P | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0173672 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1309912 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/0481 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND RECHNERPROGRAMMPRODUKTE FÜR DYNAMISCHE PLANUNG UND MATRIX ERFASSUNG VON DATEN ÜBER PROBEN | [2003/20] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR DYNAMIC SCHEDULING AND MATRIX COLLECTING OF DATA ABOUT SAMPLES | [2003/20] | French: | PROCEDES, SYSTEMES ET PROGICIELS POUR LA PROGRAMMATION DYNAMIQUE ET COLLECTION DE DONNEES DE MATRICE CONCERNANT DES ECHANTILLONS | [2003/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2001 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 06.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/15] | 05.03.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.03.2018 | 26.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5367619 (DIPAOLO WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-13,73-85 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - line 48 * * column 4, line 46 - line 59 * * column 11, line 6 - line 9 * * column 16, line 54 - column 18, line 1 * [A] 21,57,93 | Examination | US6037939 |