EP1311913 - SYSTEM AND METHODOLOGY FOR ADAPTIVE, LINEAR MODEL PREDICTIVE CONTROL BASED ON RIGOROUS, NONLINEAR PROCESS MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB, Inc. 501 Merritt 7 Norwalk CT 06851 / US | [2005/41] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states ABB Automation Inc. 501 Merrit 7 Norwalk, CT 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESS, Todd, M. 4679 Nottingham Court Ashland, KY 41101 / US | 02 /
KROLL, Andreas Rottmannstrasse 11 69121 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
LINDBERG, Carl-Fredrik, S., M. Geijersgatan 11B S-723 35 Vasteras / SE | 04 /
MODEN, Per, Erik Vetterslundsgatan 176 S-724 62 Vasteras / SE | 05 /
PETERSSON, Mikael Syrenvagen 3 S-224 56 Lund / SE | 06 /
PRAPROST, Kenneth, L. 11745 Legend Creek Drive Chesterland, OH 44026 / US | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Marks, Frank ABB Patent GmbH Oberhausener Strasse 33 40472 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Marks, Frank ABB Patent GmbH, Oberhausener Strasse 33 40472 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01922867.5 | 30.03.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001US10180 | Priority number, date | US20000544390 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: US 544390 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0179945 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1311913 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1311913 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/04 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
G05B13/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ADAPTIVEN MODEL-BASIERTEN PRÄDIKTIVEN, AUF EIN SCHARFSE NICHT-LINEARES PROZESSMODEL BASIERTE STEUERUNG | [2003/21] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODOLOGY FOR ADAPTIVE, LINEAR MODEL PREDICTIVE CONTROL BASED ON RIGOROUS, NONLINEAR PROCESS MODEL | [2003/21] | French: | SYSTEME ET METHODOLOGIE DE COMMANDES ADAPTATIVES DE PREDICTION DE MODELES BASES SUR UN MODELE DE PROCESSUS RIGOUREUX ET NON LINEAIRE | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.01.2003 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | 22.01.2003 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.01.2003 | M02   Fee paid on   11.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | BE | 01.06.2005 | CY | 01.06.2005 | FR | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | TR | 01.06.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | GR | 01.09.2005 | ES | 12.09.2005 | PT | 03.11.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
TR | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5424942 (DONG YANG [US], et al) [A] 1,18,24,29,31,33,35 * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 53 *; | [A]US5488561 (BERKOWITZ PETER N [US], et al) [A] 1,18,24,29,31,33,35 * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 60 *; | [A]US5519605 (CAWLFIELD DAVID W [US]) [A] 1,18,24,29,31,33,35 * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 63 *; | [DA]US5682309 (BARTUSIAK RAYMOND DONALD [US], et al); | [DA]US5740033 (WASSICK JOHN M [US], et al); | [A] - P.VEGA ET AL, "EVALUATION OF ADVANCED REGULATORS FOR AN EVAPORATION STATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1994 3RD INTERNATIONAL FUZZY SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, USA, (19940626), vol. 1, pages 648 - 654, XP001023797 [A] 1,18,24,29,31,33,35 * page 651, column L, line 5 - page 652, column L, line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FUZZY.1994.343722 | [A] - R.MEHRA ET AL, "TEMPERATURE CONTROL OF HOT ISISTATIC PRESSING (HIP) FURNACE USING MODEL PREDICTIVE AND RISK SENSITIVE OPTIMAL CONTROLLERS", PROCEEIDNGS OF THE 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONTROL APPLICATIONS, USA, (19950928), pages 949 - 954, XP001023826 [A] 1,18,24,29,31,33,35 * page 949, column L, line 1 - page 951, column L, line 16 * | [A] - M.TVRZSKA DE GOUVEA ET AL, "ROSSMPC: A new way of representing and analysing predictive controllers", 5TH UK NATIONAL HEAT TRANSFER CONFERENCE, UK, (19970917), vol. 75, no. A7, pages 693 - 708, XP001023928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1205/026387697524191 |