EP1273164 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INTERNET-BASED TELEPHONE ACCESS TO PREPAID CARD AND PIN SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MCI Worldcom, Inc. 515 East Amite Street Jackson, MS 39201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states MCI Worldcom, Inc. 515 East Amite Street Jackson, MI 19201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yali 2678 Carnation Drive Richardson, TX 75082 / US | 02 /
LIU, Tong 2678 Carnation Drive Richardson, TX 75082 / US | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann, Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01922977.2 | 30.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001US10454 | Priority number, date | US20000538708 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: US 538708 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0176222 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1273164 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M17/00, H04Q3/00, H04M7/00 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
H04M15/56 (EP,US);
H04M15/55 (EP,US);
H04M15/90 (EP,US);
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
H04M2215/016 (EP,US);
H04M2215/202 (EP,US);
H04M2215/44 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/02] | H04M17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR INTERNET BASIERTEN TELEFONZUGRIFF AUF SYSTEME MIT VORAUSBEZAHLTEN KARTEN UND PIN-SYSTEME | [2003/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INTERNET-BASED TELEPHONE ACCESS TO PREPAID CARD AND PIN SYSTEMS | [2003/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ACCES TELEPHONIQUE INTERNET A DES SYSTEMES DE CARTE A PREPAIEMENT ET DES SYSTEMES NIP | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 22.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/46] | 17.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9638018 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 13 * * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 12 * * page 12, line 19 - page 13, line 5 * * page 1 *; | [X]WO9821874 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 2 * * page 12, line 17 - line 23 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 30 * * figures 1,2,4A *; | [A]US5991381 (BOUANAKA HANSALI [US], et al) [A] 1-17* abstract *; | [A] - HUBAUX J-P ET AL, "The impact of the Internet on telecommunication architectures", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990211), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 257 - 273, XP004304602 [A] 1-17 * page 262, column R, paragraph 3.1 - page 263, column R * * page 265, column R, paragraph 3.2 - page 267, column R, paragraph 3.3 * * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(98)00263-3 | International search | [Y]US5991381 (BOUANAKA HANSALI [US], et al); | [AP]US6104704 (BUHLER GERHARD [US], et al); | [YP]US6137869 (VOIT ERIC A [US], et al); | [YP]US6188752 (LESLEY ULF [SE]) |