EP1373530 - PROTEIN KINASE STRESS-RELATED PROTEIN AND METHODS OF USE IN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/01] | PROTEIN KINASE STRESS-RELATED PROTEINS AND METHODS OF USE IN PLANTS | ||
[2006/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Plant Science GmbH 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DA COSTA E SILVA, Oswaldo 203 Littleford Lane Apex, NC 27502 / US | 02 /
BOHNERT, Hans, J. 26 Davis Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 03 /
VAN THIELEN, Nocha 206-T Hyde Park Court Cary, NC 27513 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Ruoying 105 Rustic Pine Court Apex, NC 27502 / US | 05 /
SARRIA-MILLAN, Rodrigo 2324 Winter Walk Circle Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01923229.7 | 06.04.2001 | [2004/01] | WO2001US11435 | Priority number, date | US20000196001P | 07.04.2000 Original published format: US 196001 P | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0177356 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1373530 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1373530 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01H5/00, A01H5/10, C07K14/415, C12N5/10, C12N15/29, C12N9/12 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
C12N15/8273 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8217 (EP,US);
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | STRESS-GEKOPPELTES PROTEIN KINASE PROTEIN SOWIE DESSEN VERWENDUNG IN PFLANZEN | [2006/25] | English: | PROTEIN KINASE STRESS-RELATED PROTEIN AND METHODS OF USE IN PLANTS | [2006/25] | French: | PROTEINE DE PROTEINE KINASE ASSOCIEE AU STRESS ET METHODES D'UTILISATION DANS LES PLANTES | [2006/25] |
Former [2004/01] | STRESS-GEKOPPELTE PROTEIN KINASE PROTEINE SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG IN PFLANZEN | ||
Former [2004/01] | PROTEIN KINASE STRESS-RELATED PROTEINS AND METHODS OF USE IN PLANTS | ||
Former [2004/01] | PROTEINES DE PROTEINE KINASE ASSOCIEES AU STRESS ET METHODES D'UTILISATION DANS LES PLANTES | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2002 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 28.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06023948.0 / EP1760146 | EP10170822.0 / EP2281894 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2006 | CY | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | FI | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.03.2007 | LU | 06.04.2007 | IE | 10.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | PT | 14.05.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/18] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 10.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 10.04.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 13.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9826045 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,5-12,17,21,26-31 * page 1, line 9 - line 12 * * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 25 * * page 12 - page 35 * [Y] 2-4,13-16,18-20,22-24; | [X]WO9954489 (CROPDESIGN NV [BE], et al) [X] 1,5-12,17,21,27-31 * page 2, line 15 - page 32, line 30; examples 1-3 *; | [X]WO0006706 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,5-12,17,21,25,27-31 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MACHUKA J ET AL, "SEQUENCE ANALYSIS OF EXPRESSED SEQUENCE TAGS FROM AN ABA-TREATED CDNA LIBRARY IDENTIFIES STRESS RESPONSE GENES IN THE MOSS PHYSCOMITRELLA PATENS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON TRANSPORTATION ELECTRONICS, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1999), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 378 - 387, XP000946663 [Y] 2-4,13-16,18-20,22-24 * page 378 - page 382; tables 1,2 * | [A] - JONAK CLAUDIA ET AL, "Stress signaling in plants: A mitogen-activated protein kinase pathway is activated by cold and drought", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (1996), vol. 93, no. 20, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11274 - 11279, XP002176204 [A] 1,5-12,17,21,27-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.20.11274 | [AD] - LI, Z. ET AL., "Leucine-rich repeat transmembrane protein kinase 1", SWALL, (19981101), Database accession no. O81105, URL: EBI, XP002191505 [AD] 2,13,18,22 * abstract * |