04.07.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
01.04.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2014 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.08.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.12.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.09.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.08.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.06.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.08.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.05.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
28.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.04.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2006 |
First examination report |
|
09.12.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
11.06.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
26.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
28.11.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
19.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|