05.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
08.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
03.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
01.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
16.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
26.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] |
19.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
19.05.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
24.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
27.05.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
04.05.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.05.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.11.2004 |
Change - French title |
published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |
22.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.11.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
21.11.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
11.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2003 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
06.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|